Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2021 at 10:30:17 (UTC).

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Zydus Worldwide DMCC et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Merck Sharp Dohme Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zydus Worldwide DMCC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Defendants

Zydus Worldwide DMCC

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Cadila Healthcare Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael P. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

David B. Abramowitz

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

Michael J. Gaertner

Carolyn A. Blessing

Christopher J. Cassella

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/13/2021, at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/29/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00315-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#19

(#19) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#18

(#18) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Worldwide DMCC filed by Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#17

(#17) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cadila Healthcare Ltd.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Phillips, John) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

15 #3

Certification of Carolyn A. Blessing

15 #2

Certification of David B. Abramowitz

15 #1

Certification of Michael J. Gaertner

15 #459

(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing and Christopher J. Cassella - filed by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Gaertner, #2 Certification of David B. Abramowitz, #3 Certification of Carolyn A. Blessing, #4 Certification of Christopher J. Casella)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Service made on Defendant Zydus Worldwide DMCC on March 19, 2021, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 3/19/2021 (nms). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,326,708. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Phillips, John) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/13/2021, at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/29/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00315-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Cassella,Carolyn A. Blessing for Cadila Healthcare Ltd.,for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.,for Zydus Worldwide DMCC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 21-cv-00315-RGA, 19-md-02902-RGA (myr). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Worldwide DMCC filed by Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cadila Healthcare Ltd.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Phillips, John) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz for Cadila Healthcare Ltd.,for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.,for Zydus Worldwide DMCC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 21-cv-00315-RGA, 19-md-02902-RGA (myr) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The answer (D.I. 11), and disclosure statements (D.I. 12, 13, and 14) have been removed from the docket. This case is part of an MDL and therefore requires reference made in the caption to the MDL as well as filing therein. Defendants shall refile the documents accordingly (nms) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (D.I. 15 in 21-cv-315-RGA; D.I. 459 in 19-md-2902-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing and Christopher J. Cassella, filed by Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00315-RGA, 1:19-md-02902-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing and Christopher J. Cassella - filed by Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Gaertner, #2 Certification of David B. Abramowitz, #3 Certification of Carolyn A. Blessing, #4 Certification of Christopher J. Casella)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Service made on Defendant Zydus Worldwide DMCC on March 19, 2021, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 3/19/2021 (nms). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration filed at D.I. 6 has been removed per the filers request. An amended version will be refiled. (nms) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation and proposed order filed at D.I. 6 has been removed from the docket. This case is part of an MDL and therefore requires reference made in the caption to the MDL as well as filing therein. Plaintiff shall refile the document accordingly. (nms) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,326,708. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3554691.) - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cadila Healthcare Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M. Silver