This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 12:25:28 (UTC).

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Wyeth LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Merck Sharp Dohme Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wyeth LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Wyeth LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

John G. Day

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexis Adian Smith

Jennifer J. Chheda

Arlene L. Chow

Andrea W. Jeffries

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Amit H. Thakore

C. Sebastian Zonte

John P. Scheibeler

Lauren K. Pelletier

Dimitrios T. Drivas

Stephanie S. Riley

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

267 East Main Street

Newark, DE 19711

Arthur G. Connolly, III

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brandon Ryan Harper

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Exhibit A to C

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/1/2021, at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2021. (nms) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,895,024 ;8,808,708 ;9,399,060 . (Riley, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wyeth LLC. (Riley, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., by Wyeth LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Riley, Stephanie) Modified on 3/5/2021 (nms). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Dimitrios T. Drivas, John P. Scheibeler, Amit H. Thakore, C. Sebastian Zonte, Lauren K. Pelletier for Wyeth LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dimitrios T. Drivas, John P. Scheibeler, Amit H. Thakore, C. Sebastian Zonte, & Lauren Kuehn Pelletier, filed by Wyeth LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2021. (nms) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dimitrios T. Drivas, John P. Scheibeler, Amit H. Thakore, C. Sebastian Zonte, & Lauren Kuehn Pelletier - filed by Wyeth LLC. (Riley, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Wyeth LLC answer due 3/4/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/22/2021. (nms) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Wyeth LLC. (Riley, Stephanie) Modified on 1/22/2021 (nms). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrea W. Jeffries for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Alexis Adian Smith for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony M. Insogna, Andrea W. Jeffries, Alexis Adian Smith, Ryan B. McCrum, Jennifer J. Chheda, Arlene L. Chow, and Ernest Yakob, Ph.D., filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2021. (nms) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony M. Insogna, Andrea W. Jeffries, Alexis Adian Smith, Ryan B. McCrum, Jennifer J. Chheda, Arlene L. Chow, and Ernest Yakob, Ph.D. - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Wyeth LLC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Day, John) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co.,Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,895,024 ;8,808,708 ;9,399,060. (apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Wyeth LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3455949.) - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis Adian Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Weiss Jeffries