This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2020 at 20:13:59 (UTC).

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. v. PFIZER INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 MERCK SHARP DOHME CORP filed an Other lawsuit against PFIZER INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL S. DIAMOND and JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02011

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAUL S. DIAMOND

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

Defendants

WENDY J. WATSON

PFIZER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMES S. URBAN

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant Street, Suite 3100

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

RANDALL E. KAY

Attorney at JONES DAY

4655 Executive Dr Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

STEPHANIE E. PARKER

Attorney at JONES DAY

1420 Peachtree St Ne Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30309-3053

STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR.

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1735 Market St., 23Rd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

STEVEN M. LEVITAN

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

4085 Campbell Ave Suite 100

Menlo Park, CA 94025

ARLENE L. CHOW

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

875 Third Ave

New York, NY 10022

RYAN B. MCCRUM

Attorney at JONES DAY

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

VIRGINIA A. GIBSON

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1735 Market Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANTHONY M. INSOGNA

Attorney at JONES DAY

4655 Executive Dr Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

JEFFREY J. BRESCH

Attorney at JONES DAY

500 Grant St Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

ILANA H. EISENSTEIN

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

1650 Market Street, Suite 4900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY D. SMITH

Attorney at DECOTIIS, FITZPATRICK, COLE & GIBLIN, LLP

61 South Paramus Road, Suite 250

Paramus, NJ 07652

SHERYN GEORGE

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

CARLTON E. WESSEL

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

500 Eighth St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

DANIEL LEDESMA

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

STEFAN M. MENTZER

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

RAHUL SARKAR

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

DIMITRIOS DRIVAS

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

LAURA LOGSDON

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

JOHN P. SCHEIBELER

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1155 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#86

RESTRICTED

#85

RESTRICTED

84 #2

Attachment A

84 #1

Certificate of Service

#84

#83

63 #7

Exhibit E

63 #6

Exhibit D

63 #4

Exhibit B

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

CASE FORMS

#1

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) Transcript of Hearing held on 11/26/19, before Judge SANCHEZ. Court Reporter/Transcriber VERITEXT TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE.. (rf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/26/2019 (nd, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) NOTICE by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LONEY, STEPHEN) (Main Document 84 replaced on 11/20/2019 with chambers permission ) (nd, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/20/2019 with chambers permission) (nd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #2 Attachment A with Chambers permission) (nd, ). Modified on 11/20/2019 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS PFIZER INC. AND WENDY J. WATSON'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (DOCS. 48 & 50) ARE DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/19. 11/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ORDER THAT AN ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOCUMENTS #63 AND #64 WILL BE HELD ON 11/26/2019 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 14B SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/13/2019. 11/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 11/14/2019 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PFIZER INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PFIZER INC.. *FILED UNDER SEAL* (rf, ) (md, ). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/16/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER THAT MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE UNREDACTED VERSION OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PFIZER'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/15/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Cert of Service filed by WENDY J. WATSON. (CIPPARONE, ROCCO) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) Consent MOTION to Seal Document #76 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by PFIZER INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EISENSTEIN, ILANA) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RANDALL E. KAY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/21/19. 5/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO KAY AND UNREPS AND E-MAILED. *ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION PACKET SENT TO KAY ON 5/21/19*(rf, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kendra Watson re: served Summons, Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Amy McLaren of The Corporation Trust Company on behalf of Pfizer Inc. by hand service on 05/15/2019 (URBAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/14/19. 5/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anthony M. Insogna ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13540079.) filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..Certificate of Service.(URBAN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Randall E. Kay ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13538140.) filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..Motion for Admission of Randall E. Kay Pro Hac Vice, Certificate of Service.(URBAN, JAMES) Modified on 5/15/2019 (md). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ryan B. McCrum ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13536918.) filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..Application for Pro Hac Admission of Ryan B. McCrum, Certificate of Service.(URBAN, JAMES) Modified on 5/13/2019 (md). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (jl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • 2 Summons Issued as to PFIZER INC., WENDY J. WATSON. Forwarded To: JAMES URBAN on 5/10/19 (jl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(jl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PFIZER INC., WENDY J. WATSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197074.), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheryn George

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL LEDESMA