This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 08:04:11 (UTC).

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. et al v. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Merck Sharp Dohme Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20217

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland)

1500 Miami Center, 201 S. Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC

1500 Miami Center, 201 S. Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

MSD International GmbH

1500 Miami Center, 201 S. Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC

1500 Miami Center, 201 S. Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

333 Avenue Of The Americas

Miami, FL 33131

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter S. Choi

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas D. Rein

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Gwen Hochman Stewart

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Leif Peterson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Eric Christu

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

525 Okeechobee Boulevard, Suite 1100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Stephen Bernard Gillman

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

Stephanie Koh

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC re #1 Complaint,, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Actavis Laboratories, #2 Summon(s) Actavis Pharma, #3 Teva Pharmaceuticals) (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#8

(#8) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Thomas D. Rein, Stephanie P. Koh, Gwen Hochman Stewart, Leif Peterson, Peter S. Choi, mailing date January 17, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

7 #1

Summon(s) Actavis Laboratories

1 #2

Exhibit United States Patent 2013

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/28/2020) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

7 #3

Teva Pharmaceuticals

1 #6

Exhibit New Jersey Complaint

13 #1

Order

1 #1

Exhibit United States Patent 2011

#12

(#12) ORDER. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit United States Patent 2011

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cbr) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit United States Patent 2008

#13

(#13) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Order) (mee) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit United States Patent 2014

7 #2

Summon(s) Actavis Pharma

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12316485, filed by Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., MSD International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States Patent 2011, #2 Exhibit United States Patent 2013, #3 Exhibit United States Patent 2008, #4 Exhibit United States Patent 2011, #5 Exhibit United States Patent 2014, #6 Exhibit New Jersey Complaint)(Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Order) (mee) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/28/2020) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cbr) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Thomas D. Rein, Stephanie P. Koh, Gwen Hochman Stewart, Leif Peterson, Peter S. Choi, mailing date January 17, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC re #1 Complaint,, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Actavis Laboratories, #2 Summon(s) Actavis Pharma, #3 Teva Pharmaceuticals) (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC re #1 Complaint,, 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD International GmbH, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC (Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mee) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12316485, filed by Optimer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Cubist Pharmaceuticals LLC, MSD Investment Holdings (Ireland), Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., MSD International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States Patent 2011, #2 Exhibit United States Patent 2013, #3 Exhibit United States Patent 2008, #4 Exhibit United States Patent 2011, #5 Exhibit United States Patent 2014, #6 Exhibit New Jersey Complaint)(Gillman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.