This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2020 at 09:38:55 (UTC).

MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. GLAND PHARMA LIMITED

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 MERCK SHARP DOHME B filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02750

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

ORGANON USA INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

GLAND PHARMA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

J. BRUGH LOWER

Attorney at GIBBONS PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

Attorney at MIDLIGE RICHTER LLC

645 Martinsville Road

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/7/20. (LM, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. by GLAND PHARMA LIMITED.(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of GLAND PHARMA LIMITED (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (LOWER, J.) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

1 #5

L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GLAND PHARMA LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10546124), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/7/20. (LM, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. by GLAND PHARMA LIMITED.(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of GLAND PHARMA LIMITED (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketChief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel no longer assigned to case. (jjc, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (jjc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (LOWER, J.) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GLAND PHARMA LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10546124), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAND PHARMA LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where ORGANON USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. BRUGH LOWER