This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:55:25 (UTC).

Merchant v. United States of America, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Merchant filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Merchant

Defendants

Internal Revenue Service

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Edward Niehaus

Attorney at Bodkin, Niehaus & Dickson PLLC

207 W. Hickory Street, Suite 309

Denton, TX 76201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8755778.), filed by Dana Merchant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Niehaus, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Internal Revenue Service and emailed to plaintiff for service. (las, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America and emailed to plaintiff for service. (las, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. United States of America served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Niehaus, Jason) Modified on 3/7/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. (Niehaus, Jason) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/9/2022 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. Internal Revenue Service served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Niehaus, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. Internal Revenue Service served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Niehaus, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. (Niehaus, Jason) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/9/2022 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding #4 Summons Returned Executed: INCOMPLETE FILING. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY. (mcg) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Merchant. United States of America served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Niehaus, Jason) Modified on 3/7/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America and emailed to plaintiff for service. (las, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Internal Revenue Service and emailed to plaintiff for service. (las, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mcg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8755778.), filed by Dana Merchant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Niehaus, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant