This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2021 at 12:17:54 (UTC).

Merch Traffic, LLC v. Does 1-100 et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Merch Traffic, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Does 1-100. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rya W. Zobel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11340

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rya W. Zobel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merch Traffic, LLC

Defendants

John Does 1-100

Jane Does 1-100

XYZ Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Lawrence Oliverio

Attorney at Polsinelli P.C.

21St Floor, 100 Cambridge Street

Boston, MA 02114

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and seizure order, entered.(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

15 #1

Exhibit A Proofs of Service

15 #15

Main Document

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#11

(#11) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 9/14/2021 09:45 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.)(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

9 #3

Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC filed by on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) DECLARATION re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Merch Traffic, LLC of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8908307 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and seizure order, entered.(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#17) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/15/2021. No one appears for defts. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Oliverio) Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ, 1:21-cv-11340-RWZ(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Show Cause Hearing REset for 9/15/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proofs of Service)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086191 for monies received on 8/25/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: #11 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. (Barbosa, Nilsa) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#12) RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086190 for monies received on 8/25/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: (11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ, 11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ) Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ et al.(Barbosa, Nilsa) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 9/14/2021 09:45 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.)(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC filed by on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Merch Traffic, LLC of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8908307 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Lawrence Oliverio