This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2021 at 10:17:37 (UTC).

Mercedes v. Kohl's Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Mercedes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kohl's Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grubbs Mercedes

Hamilton, OH 45011

Mercedes Grubbs

Defendants

Kohl's Department Stores Inc

Kohl's Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brianna Renay Carden

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

11260 Chester Rd Suite 825

Cincinnati, OH 45140

Evan R McFarland

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm LLC

11260 Chester Road, Suite 825

Cincinnati, OH 45246

Matthew G Bruce

11260 Chester Road, Suite 825

Cincinnati, OH 45246

Defendant Attorney

M Scott McIntyre

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Renay Carden for Plaintiff Mercedes Grubbs (Carden, Brianna) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Kohl's Inc.. (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Kohl's Inc., Kohl's Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Inc... (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 6/29/2021 in Butler County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. CV 2021 06 0903) by Mercedes Grubbs against Kohl's Inc. (eh) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

1 #5

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Butler Co. Notice

1 #2

Exhibit B-A. Martin Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Renay Carden for Plaintiff Mercedes Grubbs (Carden, Brianna) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction re [FORMER DOC 6]: Document filed in error. (kh) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Kohl's Inc.. (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Kohl's Inc. to answer, plead, or otherwise respond by 8/26/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/2/21. (sct) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/26/2021. by Defendant Kohl's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Kohl's Inc., Kohl's Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Inc... (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 6/29/2021 in Butler County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. CV 2021 06 0903) by Mercedes Grubbs against Kohl's Inc. (eh) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler Co. Court of Common Pleas, case number 21 06 0903 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8426056), filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-A. Martin Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Butler Co. Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (McIntyre, M) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan McFarland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Gilbert Bruce