This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:58:42 (UTC).

Mercado v. Warden Garrido

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Mercado filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Garrido. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zack Hawthorn and Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00351

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zack Hawthorn

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Francisco Mercado

Beaumont, TX 77720

Respondent

Warden Garrido

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Francisco Mercado on 9/4/20 as to #2 Order re IFP. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Petitioner shall, within twenty (20) days from the date set forth below, submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement prepared by an authorized prison official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioner's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/21/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#1) MEMO In Support of 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition against Warden Garrido filed by Francisco Mercado.(bmf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Francisco Mercado on 9/4/20 as to #2 Order re IFP. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100020802. (bmf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Petitioner shall, within twenty (20) days from the date set forth below, submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement prepared by an authorized prison official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioner's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/21/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bmf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMO In Support of 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition against Warden Garrido filed by Francisco Mercado.(bmf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less