This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 08:47:15 (UTC).

Mercado v. PetSmart, LLC.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Mercado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PetSmart, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Keenan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07162

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Keenan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fabiola Mercado

Bronx, NY 10467

Defendant

PetSmart, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Seth Brian Rubine

Attorney at RUBINE & CHA, LLC, Attorneys at Law

201 W Passaic St, Ste 203, Suite 203

Rochelle Park, NJ 07662

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Seth Brian Rubine on behalf of PetSmart, LLC.. New Address: Rubine + Cha, LLC, 201 W Passaic St, Ste 203, Rochelle Park, NJ, United States 07662, 2018575815..(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 20-C on November 3, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., for an initial pretrial conference, for the purpose of discussing the status of this case. This conference will not be adjourned except by order of the Court. SO ORDERED., Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/27/2021) (rj) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John F. Keenan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Seth Brian Rubine. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Seth Brian Rubine. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Emily Lavelle, Esq on 8/25/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BC Partners for PetSmart, LLC.. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC...(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by PetSmart, LLC..(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 807097/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24979150).Document filed by PetSmart, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth B. Rubine