This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 08:25:36 (UTC).

Mercado-Olivera et al v. Collection and Management Assistance Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Mercado-Olivera filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Collection and Management Assistance Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Juan M. Perez-Gimenez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01939

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Juan M. Perez-Gimenez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carmen Teresa Mercado-Olivera

Sabana Grande, PR 00637

Carmen Olivieri-Arenas

Defendants

Collection and Management Assistance Inc.

Capital Center Bldg., Suite 1102, Avenida Arterial Hostos #239

San Juan, PR 00918-1477

Ponce Federal Bank, FSB

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by all Plaintiffs, Pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Affidavit) (gav). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Collection and Management Assistance Inc., Ponce Federal Bank, FSB, filed by Carmen Teresa Mercado-Olivera, Carmen Olivieri-Arenas, Pro se. Service due by 12/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(gav) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/4/2019. (RIF) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/4/2019. (RIF) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by all Plaintiffs, Pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Affidavit) (gav). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by all Plaintiffs, Pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Collection and Management Assistance Inc., Ponce Federal Bank, FSB, filed by Carmen Teresa Mercado-Olivera, Carmen Olivieri-Arenas, Pro se. Service due by 12/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(gav) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.