This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 07:27:53 (UTC).

M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc. v. Alphabet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 M E O W I E Foundation Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alphabet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucy H. Koh and Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-07421

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lucy H. Koh

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc. doing business as Beach Broadcast

Carrol Hall

Defendants

Alphabet Inc.

Google LLC doing business as YouTube

XXVI Holdings Inc

John Does 1-10

Jane Does 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael John Collins

2141 West Vineyard Street

Wailuku, HI 96753

Michael John Collins,

Attorney at Cain and Herren, Attorneys at Law

2141 West Vineyard Street

Wailuku, HI 96753

Defendant Attorneys

Amit Q. Gressel

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

1 Market Place, Spear Tower, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Brian M. Willen

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The America, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10019-6022

Kristin S. Shigemura

Attorney at Cades Schutte LLP

Cades Schutte Building1000 Bishop Street 12Th Flr

Honolulu, HI 96813

Amit Quint Gressel

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.

One Market Plaza

Spear Tower, SU 3300

Allison Mizuo Lee

Attorney at Cades Schutte

1000 Bishop St 12Th Flr

Honolulu, HI 96813-4216

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh conditionally granting #46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

46 #1

Proposed Order PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

46 #46

Main Document

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael John Collins (Collins, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

24 #5

Exhibit 3

24 #4

Exhibit 2

24 #3

Exhibit 1

24 #2

Declaration of Allison Mizuo Lee

#24

6 #5

Certificate of Service

6 #4

Notice of Hearing Motion

6 #1

Declaration of Michael J. Collins

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh conditionally granting #46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Carrol Hall, M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2021. Replies due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL)(Collins, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The proper event is a motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #45 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Carrol Hall, M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael John Collins (Collins, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is SET for Wednesday, January 26, 2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. A hearing on #24 Defendants Alphabet, Inc. and Google LLC's MOTION to Dismiss is SET for Thursday, January 6, 2022 at 1:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Correction of clerical error upon assignment.. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 14, 2022 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoo m/. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#40) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC.. (Gressel, Amit) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of #6 First Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc.. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2021 is CONTINUED to 7/19/2021 at 8:45 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#8) EO: On 5/12/2021, Plaintiffs filed a Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. First, it does not appear that the motion contains the required certification under Local Rule 7.8, which requires the filing party to certify that they conferred at least seven days prior to filing the motion with opposing counsel to discuss thoroughly the substance of the contemplated motion and any potential partial or complete resolution. See LR7.8. Second, the Motion does not comply Local Rule 10.4, which requires the filing party to include a copy of "the proposed amended pleading in redline format, which must indicate in every respect how the proposed amended pleading differs from the pleading which it amends, by striking through the text to be deleted and underlining the text to be added." LR10.4.No later than 5/17/2021, Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a supplemental declaration in support of the Motion attaching the proposed Second Amended Complaint in redline format. No later than 5/21/2021, Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a second supplemental declaration stating that the required Local Rule 7.8 conference took place and the result of the conference. If the parties are able to reach a resolution, the appropriate stipulation may be submitted to the Court at porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution on the Motion, the Court will decide the Motion without a hearing and directs briefing as follows: any opposition shall be filed no later than 6/7/2021; reply shall be filed no later than 6/21/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Michael John Collins appearing for Plaintiff M.E.O.W.I.E. Foundation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Collins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, #4 Notice of Hearing Motion, #5 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/6/2021. (emt, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/2/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00215 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Allison) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Defendants Alphabet, Inc. and Google LLC, dba YouTube's NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alphabet, Inc., Google LLC dba YouTube from Second Circuit Court, case number 2CCV-21-0000061. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2518659), filed by Alphabet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint; Exhibit A; Jury Trial Demand; Summons - 2CCV-21-0000061) , #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Allison) Modified on 4/30/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XXVI Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alphabet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amit Quint Gressel