This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:09:02 (UTC).

Menzel v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Menzel filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales, U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00781

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Menzel

Defendants

Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Toyota Motor North America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Lynn Judkins

Attorney at Normand PLLC

3165 Mccrory Place, Suite 175

Orlando, FL 32803

Daniel S. Levy

Attorney at Law Office of Richard S. Cornfeld, LLC

1010 Market Street, Suite 1645

St. Louis, MO 63101

Edmund A. Normand

Attorney at Normand Law PLLC

P.O. Box 140036

Orlando, FL 32814

Mark C. Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Mike Arias

Attorney at Arias, Sanguinetti, Stahle & Torrijos, LLP

Suite 1400, 6701 Center Drive West

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Richard S. Cornfeld

Attorney at Law Office of Richard S. Cornfeld, LLC

1010 Market Street, Suite 1645

St. Louis, MO 63101

Thomas P. Rosenfeld

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Jacob Lawrence Phillips

Attorney at Normand Law PLLC

P.O. Box 140036

Orlando, FL 32814

Defendant Attorney

Anitra R. Clement

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 the joint motion for an extension of time. By November 22, 2021, (1) the defendants must respond to the complaint, and (2) the parties must file a case management report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/6/2021. (VNG) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Case Management Report by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Clement, Anitra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER directing compliance with Local Rule 2.01. Daniel Levy, Mark Goldenberg, Richard Cornfeld, and Thomas Rosenfeld must either become members of the Court's bar or obtain special admission by October 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/4/2021. (VNG) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to counsel Daniel S. Levy, Mark C. Goldenberg, Richard S. Cornfeld & Thomas P. Rosenfeld of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGR) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 the unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., and Toyota Motor North America, Inc., must respond to the complaint by October 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/1/2021. (KNR) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Raiford, Anitra) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Raiford, Anitra) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Raiford, Anitra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF of service executed on 8/17/2021 by Sharon Menzel as to Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Phillips, Jacob) (Modified on 8/18/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF of service executed on 8/17/2021 by Sharon Menzel as to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Phillips, Jacob) (Modified on 8/18/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (BGR) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0781-MMH-PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18586022) filed by Sharon Menzel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Phillips, Jacob) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anitra R. Clement