This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2021 at 10:58:22 (UTC).

Menjivar et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Menjivar filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Executive Office for Immigration Review. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lydia Kay Griggsby and James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02355

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lydia Kay Griggsby

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lennis Landaverde Menjivar

Fernando Turcios Escobar

Ada Rodas Sanchez

Rigoberto Garcia Zavala

Carlos Pena Sanchez

Marta Campos Martinez

Mauricio Antonio Padilla

Alfredo Tuangco

Enna Campos Ulloa

Adriana Trejos Garcia

Maria Lucero

Lebert James

Jose Chavarria Alfaro

Dora Argueta

Wilber Ramos Diaz

Jairo Posadas Mendoza

Emeka Obijuru

Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna

Vasquez Santos Diaz

Yesel Turcios Gonzalez

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy William Davis

Attorney at Law Office of Timothy W Davis LLC

1521 S Edgewood St, Suite B

Baltimore, MD 21227

Other Attorneys

Alan Carl Lazerow

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

36 S. Charles St.

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/17/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Gomez Rodriguez, Desire Fadion, Susika Kalpitha Pelawata, Erika Amaya Calderon, Mauricio Antonio Padilla, Wyatt Molina Rodriguez, Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna, Jairo Posadas Mendoza, Cyril Iweh, Jose Flores Zelaya, Juan Leon Asmen, Elias Rivera Monterola, Williams Baca Gomez, Yesel Turcios Gonzalez, Adriana Trejos Garcia, Jonathan Enamorado Leon, Manuel Amaya Saravia, Maria Lucero, Aleida Lopez Velasquez, Adeolu Onasanya, Anyi Ayala Sanchez, Marina Sanchez Sanchez, Keith Shaw, Jose Castillo Reyes, Lebert James, Wilber Ramos Diaz, Gabriela Gonzalez Chavez, Everton Ribeiro, Milagro Cruz De Flores, Emilio Diaz Amaya, Vasquez Santos Diaz, Carlos Trigueros Barillas, Edin Mejia Alvarenga, Fernando Turcios Escobar, Emeka Obijuru, Lennis Landaverde Menjivar, Karina Gomez Rodriguez, Roberto Orellana Cruz, Oscar Vasquez Turcios, Sandra Moran Castillo, Dora Argueta, Raul Cruz Interiano, Damaris Lopez Velasquez, Lindel Godoy Alvarenga, Anthony Campos Guevara, Juan Bacca Gutierrez, Pablo Cedillos, Julio Gonzalez Chavez, Juan Medina Cruz, Jose Chavarria Alfaro, Marta Campos Martinez, Samuel Alfaro Salinas, Ada Rodas Sanchez, Josue Saravia Saravia, Enna Campos Ulloa, Irma Velasquez Mendez, Wendy Hernandez Berrios, Alfredo Tuangco, Rigoberto Garcia Zavala, Juan Bin Chi, Victor Privado Membreno, Yudy Arias Aguilar, Carlos Pena Sanchez. All Defendants.(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Executive Office for Immigration Review (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due 11/22/21. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Executive Office for Immigration Review (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Gomez Rodriguez, Desire Fadion, Susika Kalpitha Pelawata, Erika Amaya Calderon, Mauricio Antonio Padilla, Wyatt Molina Rodriguez, Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna, Jairo Posadas Mendoza, Cyril Iweh, Jose Flores Zelaya, Juan Leon Asmen, Elias Rivera Monterola, Williams Baca Gomez, Yesel Turcios Gonzalez, Adriana Trejos Garcia, Jonathan Enamorado Leon, Manuel Amaya Saravia, Maria Lucero, Aleida Lopez Velasquez, Adeolu Onasanya, Anyi Ayala Sanchez, Marina Sanchez Sanchez, Keith Shaw, Jose Castillo Reyes, Lebert James, Wilber Ramos Diaz, Gabriela Gonzalez Chavez, Everton Ribeiro, Milagro Cruz De Flores, Emilio Diaz Amaya, Vasquez Santos Diaz, Carlos Trigueros Barillas, Edin Mejia Alvarenga, Fernando Turcios Escobar, Emeka Obijuru, Lennis Landaverde Menjivar, Karina Gomez Rodriguez, Roberto Orellana Cruz, Oscar Vasquez Turcios, Sandra Moran Castillo, Dora Argueta, Raul Cruz Interiano, Damaris Lopez Velasquez, Lindel Godoy Alvarenga, Anthony Campos Guevara, Juan Bacca Gutierrez, Pablo Cedillos, Julio Gonzalez Chavez, Juan Medina Cruz, Jose Chavarria Alfaro, Marta Campos Martinez, Samuel Alfaro Salinas, Ada Rodas Sanchez, Josue Saravia Saravia, Enna Campos Ulloa, Irma Velasquez Mendez, Wendy Hernandez Berrios, Alfredo Tuangco, Rigoberto Garcia Zavala, Juan Bin Chi, Victor Privado Membreno, Yudy Arias Aguilar, Carlos Pena Sanchez. All Defendants.(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/17/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 60 days as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14637129724), filed by Daniel Gomez Rodriguez, Desire Fadion, Susika Kalpitha Pelawata, Erika Amaya Calderon, Mauricio Antonio Padilla, Wyatt Molina Rodriguez, Auxiliadora Hernandez Luna, Jairo Posadas Mendoza, Cyril Iweh, Jose Flores Zelaya, Juan Leon Asmen, Elias Rivera Monterola, Williams Baca Gomez, Yesel Turcios Gonzalez, Adriana Trejos Garcia, Jonathan Enamorado Leon, Manuel Amaya Saravia, Maria Lucero, Aleida Lopez Velasquez, Adeolu Onasanya, Anyi Ayala Sanchez, Marina Sanchez Sanchez, Keith Shaw, Jose Castillo Reyes, Lebert James, Wilber Ramos Diaz, Gabriela Gonzalez Chavez, Everton Ribeiro, Milagro Cruz De Flores, Emilio Diaz Amaya, Vasquez Santos Diaz, Carlos Trigueros Barillas, Edin Mejia Alvarenga, Fernando Turcios Escobar, Emeka Obijuru, Lennis Landaverde Menjivar, Karina Gomez Rodriguez, Roberto Orellana Cruz, Oscar Vasquez Turcios, Sandra Moran Castillo, Dora Argueta, Raul Cruz Interiano, Damaris Lopez Velasquez, Lindel Godoy Alvarenga, Anthony Campos Guevara, Juan Bacca Gutierrez, Pablo Cedillos, Julio Gonzalez Chavez, Juan Medina Cruz, Jose Chavarria Alfaro, Marta Campos Martinez, Samuel Alfaro Salinas, Ada Rodas Sanchez, Josue Saravia Saravia, Enna Campos Ulloa, Irma Velasquez Mendez, Wendy Hernandez Berrios, Alfredo Tuangco, Rigoberto Garcia Zavala, Juan Bin Chi, Victor Privado Membreno, Yudy Arias Aguilar, Carlos Pena Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Carl Lazerow