This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2022 at 09:00:07 (UTC).

Menefee v. Guild Mortgage Company LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Menefee filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Guild Mortgage Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02980

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobbie Thorn Menefee

Defendant

Guild Mortgage Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas C Barron

P.O. Box 141323

Dallas, TX 75214

Defendant Attorney

Valerie Anne Henderson

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), filed.(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER Striking Document re: #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Setting re: #4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 01:45 PM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guild Mortgage Company LLC, filed.(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#8

(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2022 re: #4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before October 18, 2022. Defendant may file its motion to dismiss on or before November 1, 2022. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendants motion within 21 days of the date on which Defendant files its motion. Defendant may file a reply brief within seven days of the date on which Plaintiff files the response. Appearances: Thomas C Barron.Melissa Vest. (ERO: yes), filed.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2022 re: #4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before October 18, 2022. Defendant may file its motion to dismiss on or before November 1, 2022. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendants motion within 21 days of the date on which Defendant files its motion. Defendant may file a reply brief within seven days of the date on which Plaintiff files the response. Appearances: Thomas C Barron.Melissa Vest. (ERO: yes), filed.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guild Mortgage Company LLC, filed.(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Setting re: #4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 01:45 PM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Striking Document re: #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for pre-motion conference re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), filed.(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketThe above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Guild Mortgage Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 457th Judicial District Court, Montgomery County, Texas, case number 22-08-09894 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28711847) filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guild Mortgage Company, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie Anne Henderson