This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2020 at 08:31:18 (UTC).

Mendoza v. SOS Security, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOS Security, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01956

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexis Mendoza

Defendants

SOS Security, LLC

Palm Deluxe Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Ross Fulton

Attorney at Jennings & Fulton, LTD.

2580 Sorrel Street

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Logan G. Willson

Attorney at Jennings and Fulton, Ltd.

2580 Sorrel St.

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Jared B. Jennings

Attorney at Jennings & Fulton, LTD

2580 Sorrel St.

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Logan Gregory Willson

Attorney at Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.

2580 Sorrel Street

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Defendant Attorneys

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Louis

8925 W Russell Rd, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Randall Tindall

Attorney at Resnick & Louis, P.C.

8925 West Russell Road, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER that Attorney Randall Tindall must read the local rules of this Court in their entirety and must file a declaration so indicating by 12/20/2019. Except as stated in this order, the #17 order to show cause is otherwise DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER Striking 11 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, 9 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, 10 Notice of Corrected Image/Document. Defendant and its counsel are hereby ORDERED to refile properly redacted versions of those documents by November 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's 12/13/19 Order by SOS Security, LLC re #20 Order,. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #17 Order to Show Cause by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than December 13, 2019, why defense counsel should not each be sanctioned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#16

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

13 #3

Exhibit

13 #2

Exhibit

#13

No Description Available

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/8/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/23/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #23 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Randall Tindall and Troy Clark. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's 12/13/19 Order by SOS Security, LLC re #20 Order,. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Alexis Mendoza. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Fulton, Adam) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IC 6-1(a)(2) and FRCP 5.2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #19 .Attorney Adam Fulton is advised to correct the deficiencies and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #19 . Do NOT link to this notice. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER that Attorney Randall Tindall must read the local rules of this Court in their entirety and must file a declaration so indicating by 12/20/2019. Except as stated in this order, the #17 order to show cause is otherwise DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) VIEW #22 corrected image to NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Alexis Mendoza. Without Prejudice (Fulton, Adam) Modified on 12/14/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 and FRCP 5.2 (MMM). Modified on 12/17/2019 (MMM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE to #17 Order to Show Cause by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than December 13, 2019, why defense counsel should not each be sanctioned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) Modified Sealed per #17 Order on 12/6/2019 (JM). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Striking 11 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, 9 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, 10 Notice of Corrected Image/Document. Defendant and its counsel are hereby ORDERED to refile properly redacted versions of those documents by November 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • (#8) (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Logan Willson is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IC 6-1(a)(2) and FRCP 5.2. Attorney Action Required to ECF Nos. #1 , #3 , and #4 .Attorneys Troy Clark and Randall Tindall are advised to correct the deficiencies and refile ECF Nos. #1 , #3 , and #4 using the event "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" and link to #1 , #3 , and #4 , respectively, no later than Friday, November 22, 2019. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/8/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/23/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IC 6-1(a)(2) and FRCP 5.2. Attorney Action Required to ECF Nos. #1 , #3 , and #4 .Attorneys Troy Clark and Randall Tindall are advised to correct the deficiencies and refile ECF Nos. #1 , #3 , and #4 using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 , #3 , and #4 , respectively.Also, the documents were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Troy Clark and Randall Tindall. The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) VIEW #15 corrected image to STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) Modified on 11/7/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 and FRCP 5.2 (MMM). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VIEW #14 corrected image to CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SOS Security, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) Modified on 11/7/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 and FRCP 5.2 (MMM). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant SOS Security, LLC. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VIEW #13 corrected image to PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-803230-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5767748) by SOS Security, LLC. Proof of service due by 1/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 11/7/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 and FRCP 5.2 (MMM). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Palm Deluxe Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOS SECURITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared B. Jennings

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Ross Fulton