This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 07:55:02 (UTC).

Mendoza v. Erckert et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Erckert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02963

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza

Defendants

National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak, a foreign corporation

Randall Erckert

Strawser Construction, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deloris King Cromartie

Attorney at Bell Legal Group

219 N Ridge Street

Georgetown, SC 29440

James Edward Bell, III

Attorney at Bell Legal Group

219 N Ridge Street

Georgetown, SC 29440

Juan Camilo Diaz Avila

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart and Shipley PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Mariano Garcia

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart and Shipley PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Christian Dietrich Searcy

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart and Shipley PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Defendant Attorney

David Starr Cobb

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 22129, 40 Calhoun Street, Suite 200

Charleston, SC 29413-2129

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza TO DEFENDANT STRAWSER AND ECRKERTS' COMPLAINT. (Bell, James) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 11/6/2020 3:30 PM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/6/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#14

(#14) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/5/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2021, Motions due by 4/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/06/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

12 #3

Proposed Order

12 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

12 #1

Affidavit and Application for Admission

#12

(#12) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Camilo Diaz Avila ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359335) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit and Application for Admission

#11

(#11) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mariano Garcia ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359322) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace with correct document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit and Application for Admission

#10

(#10) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christian D. Searcy ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359295) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Randall Erckert, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Strawser Construction, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9282176), filed by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Service due by 11/16/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza TO DEFENDANT STRAWSER AND ECRKERTS' COMPLAINT. (Bell, James) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 11/6/2020 3:30 PM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/6/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/5/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2021, Motions due by 4/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/06/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 9/30/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Camilo Diaz Avila ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359335) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mariano Garcia ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359322) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace with correct document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christian D. Searcy ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9359295) by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/30/2020 to replace corrected document as provided by filing user) (lgib, ). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randall Erckert, Strawser Construction, Inc.(Cobb, David) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Randall Erckert served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Bell, James) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Randall Erckert. Service due by 11/23/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Strawser Construction, Inc. Service due by 11/16/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. (lgib, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Randall Erckert, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Strawser Construction, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9282176), filed by Yader Antonio Urrutia Mendoza. Service due by 11/16/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less