This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 18:50:43 (UTC).

MENDOZA v. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 MENDOZA filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL R. MENDOZA

Defendants

CHAD CICCONI

ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

BRYAN SEATON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth M Motolenich-Salas

Attorney at Motosalas Law, PLLC, of Counsel To Weiss & Moy, P.C.

4455 E. Camelback Road, Suite E-261

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorney

Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.

100 Ross Street, Suite 510

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1425

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) STIPULATION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#17

(#17) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BRYAN SEATON, ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI Answer due from All Defendants. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#16

(#16) Errata re #15 Disclosure Statement by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. Reason for Correction: Corrected Caption. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#15

(#15) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Gaul, Jr on behalf of ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendant Bryan Seaton on April 20, 2020 by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #8 Disclosure Statement, #6 Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of ADR Designation, #7 Notice,, #4 Summons Issued (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

9 #1

Affidavit of Kenneth Motolenich-Salas In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac

#9

(#9) MOTION for attorney Kenneth Motolenich-Salas to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5566248) by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Motolenich-Salas In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit (Certificate of Good Standing, D. Ariz.)) (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#6

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendant Bryan Seaton on April 20, 2020 by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #8 Disclosure Statement, #6 Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of ADR Designation, #7 Notice,, #4 Summons Issued (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

3 #5

Exhibits 1-16

3 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

AO 120 Form

3 #2

Docket Sheet

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 AO 120 Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibits 1-16) (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of AO 120 form completed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #1 Complaint, (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #3

Summons as to Bryan Seaton

1 #2

Summons as Action Lab Entertainment, Inc.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER APPROVING #17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer is due on or before 6/10/20. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/5/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BRYAN SEATON, ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI Answer due from All Defendants. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Errata re #15 Disclosure Statement by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. Reason for Correction: Corrected Caption. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Gaul, Jr on behalf of ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendant Bryan Seaton on April 20, 2020 by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #8 Disclosure Statement, #6 Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of ADR Designation, #7 Notice,, #4 Summons Issued (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice Regarding Telephone Proceedings, and Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to LCvR 7.1 served on Chad Cicconi on 04/20/2020, filed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for attorney Kenneth Motolenich-Salas to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5566248) by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Motolenich-Salas In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit (Certificate of Good Standing, D. Ariz.)) (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/10/20. (jad) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued (Main Document is as to Action Lab Entertainment, Inc.)as to ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Chad Cicconi, #2 Summons issued as to Bryan Seaton) (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 AO 120 Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibits 1-16) (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2020. (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of AO 120 form completed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #1 Complaint, (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5554084), filed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as Action Lab Entertainment, Inc., #3 Summons as to Bryan Seaton, #4 Summons as to Chad Cicconi) (jv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #5 Exhibit s 1-16) (jv) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less