This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 11:03:03 (UTC).

Mendoza et al v. First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Mendoza filed an Other lawsuit against First Choice Payment Solutions G P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03349

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steve Quittschreiber

Abdul Jabbar Muhammad

Manuel Mendoza

Defendants

First Choice Payment Solutions G.P., d/b/a Sekure Merchant Solutions

First Choice Payment Solutions G.P.

First Choice Payment Solutions G.P. doing business as Sekure Merchant Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at Lemberg Law, LLC

43 Danbury Road

Wilton, CT 06897

Katherine Ann Rehan

Attorney at Katherine A. Rehan Attorney At Law

321 N. Clark St., Ste. 500

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to continue the status hearing #8 is granted. The status hearing set for 7/17/19 is reset to 8/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber to continue Initial Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Manuel Mendoza, Steve Quittschreiber, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad. First Choice Payment Solutions G.P. waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lees standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber by Katherine Ann Rehan (Rehan, Katherine) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber by Sergei Lemberg (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Manuel Mendoza, Steve Quittschreiber, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839714.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to continue the status hearing #8 is granted. The status hearing set for 7/17/19 is reset to 8/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber to continue Initial Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Manuel Mendoza, Steve Quittschreiber, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad. First Choice Payment Solutions G.P. waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lees standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant First Choice Payment Solutions G.P., d/b/a Sekure Merchant Solutions (pj, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber by Katherine Ann Rehan (Rehan, Katherine) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Manuel Mendoza, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad, Steve Quittschreiber by Sergei Lemberg (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Manuel Mendoza, Steve Quittschreiber, Abdul Jabbar Muhammad; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839714.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less