This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2022 at 12:04:44 (UTC).

Mendoza et al v. Daniels et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 Mendoza filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Daniels. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Craig S. Denney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Craig S. Denney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Justin Mendoza

Ely, NV 89301

Roy Trost

Ely, NV 89301

Defendants

William Ruebart

Tasheena Cooke

David Drummond

Deborah Striplin

Mauro

Cornnut

Stubbs

Adams

Inspector Generals Office

Steve Sisolak

Aaron Ford

Secretary of State Cevaske

Charles Daniels

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESP Law Library

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Motion to file joint complaint

1 #3

Motion for appointment of counsel

1 #4

Motion for permission to represent

1 #5

Motion for gender/pronoun recognition

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Justin Mendoza, Roy Trost. Responses due by 8/30/2022. (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Justin Mendoza, Roy Trost. (Image is identical to ECF No. #2 .) (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#4

(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigants. (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Emergency Protection Order against retaliation to prevent seual victimization by Plaintiff Roy Trost. (HKL) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Emergency Protection Order against retaliation to prevent seual victimization by Plaintiff Roy Trost. (HKL) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (WJ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigants. (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Justin Mendoza, Roy Trost. (Image is identical to ECF No. #2 .) (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Justin Mendoza, Roy Trost. Responses due by 8/30/2022. (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Justin Mendoza, Roy Trost. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to file joint complaint, #3 Motion for appointment of counsel, #4 Motion for permission to represent, #5 Motion for gender/pronoun recognition) (HKL) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Stubbs is a litigant

Latest cases where Adams is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESP Law Library