This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:56:59 (UTC).

Mendoza et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01911

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Victoria Mendoza

Rick Mendoza

Angelo Mendoza

Defendants

3M Company

ABB Incorporated

Crown Holdings

Elliott Company

Flowserve Corporation

FMC Corporation

Honeywell International Incorporated

Mccord and Company

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Rockwell Automation Incorporated

Tate Andale LLC

Viacomcbs Incorporated

Viad Corporation

Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing

ITE Circuit Breaker Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren McDowell

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Steven Scott Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Darren P McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US) - Phoenix, AZ

2525 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85016-423

Nicholas R Lane

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - San Francisco

525 Market St., 17Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nicolas P Martin

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - San Francisco

525 Market St., 17Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Taylor H Allin

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2720 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 210

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Catherine North Hounfodji

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP - Houston, TX

1000 Louisiana St., Ste. 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Larry Jay Crown

Attorney at Titus Brueckner & Levine PC

8355 E Hartford Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Elan Shai Mizrahi

Attorney at Titus Brueckner & Levine PC

8355 E Hartford Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

J Steven Sparks

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Vincent Richard Miner

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

David L O'Daniel

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Other Attorneys

Kathleen L Beiermeister

Attorney at Meagher & Geer PLLP - Scottsdale, AZ

16767 N Perimeter Dr., Ste. 210

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Briana Lynn Campbell

Attorney at Klein Thomas & Lee

340 E Palm Lane, Ste. A310

Phoenix, AZ 85004

C Megan Fischer

Attorney at Klein Thomas & Lee

340 E Palm Lane, Ste. A310

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Cale Steven Johnson

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Jeremy Arian Lite

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Lorraine Morey

Attorney at Morey Law PLLC

3877 N 7Th St., Ste. 325

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Scott P Hazen

Attorney at Cowles & Thompson PC

901 Main St., Ste. 3900

Dallas, TX 75202

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) ORDER granting #62 Stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/7/2022. (KFZ) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

62 #1

Proposed Order

#62

(#62) MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Daniel, David) Modified event on 1/7/2022 (KFZ). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#61

(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation for Eaton Corporation. (Fischer, C) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#60

(#60) Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation.(Fischer, C) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#59

(#59) ABB, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by ABB Incorporated.(Allin, Taylor) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#58

(#58) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Incorporated for IMO Industries Incorporated. (Hendricks, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

6 #38

Summons

6 #31

Summons

6 #28

Summons

6 #20

Summons

6 #11

Summons

6 #2

Summons

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiffs contend any further amendment of their Complaint (Doc. 1) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiffs must submit, no later than the time they file a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiffs could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 2/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20061020. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1911-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#57) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Hendricks, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER granting #62 Stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/7/2022. (KFZ) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Daniel, David) Modified event on 1/7/2022 (KFZ). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation for Eaton Corporation. (Fischer, C) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation.(Fischer, C) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ABB, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by ABB Incorporated.(Allin, Taylor) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Incorporated for IMO Industries Incorporated. (Hendricks, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Hendricks, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Party Alfa Laval Incorporated (sued individually and as successor-in-interest) terminated. (Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #54 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Elliott Company shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/6/2022. (KFZ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Elliott Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hounfodji, Catherine) Modified on 1/7/2022 (WLP). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Rick Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Description of deficiency: Defendant names on summonses do not match docket and/or complaint. Please refile correct summonses for these two defendants. (BAS) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, ABB Incorporated, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crane Company, Crown Holdings, Eaton Corporation, Elliott Company, Ericsson Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Fryer-Knowles Incorporated, General Electric Company, Gould Electronics Incorporated, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, McNally Industries Incorporated, Mccord and Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Plastics Engingeering Company, Rockwell Automation Incorporated, Rogers Corporation, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor Incorporated, Schneider Electric Engineering Services LLC, Siemens Energy & Automation Incorporated, Tate Andale LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Viad Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons)(Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven Scott Schulte on behalf of Plaintiffs Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiffs contend any further amendment of their Complaint (Doc. 1) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiffs must submit, no later than the time they file a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiffs could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 2/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rick Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20061020. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1911-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20061020 filed by Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza. (Schulte, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TATE ANDALE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCCORD CORPORATION FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant