This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2020 at 09:33:38 (UTC).

MENDHEIM v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 MENDHEIM filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02600

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMAS MENDHEIM

Milan, MI 48160

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kristina M. Korobov

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to March 9, 2021 to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korobov, Kristina) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina M. Korobov on behalf of Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Korobov, Kristina) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - SEE ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2020. Copy to Thomas Mendheim via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

cover pages

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)(1:18-cr-097-JMS-DML-01), filed by THOMAS MENDHEIM. (Attachments: #1 cover pages, #2 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to March 9, 2021 to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korobov, Kristina) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina M. Korobov on behalf of Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Korobov, Kristina) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - SEE ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2020. Copy to Thomas Mendheim via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)(1:18-cr-097-JMS-DML-01), filed by THOMAS MENDHEIM. (Attachments: #1 cover pages, #2 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina M. Korobov