This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2019 at 07:00:17 (UTC).

MENDEZ v. DESANTIS et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2019 MENDEZ filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against DESANTIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS, WILLIAM STAFFORD and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00272

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM STAFFORD

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUIS A MENDEZ

Respondents

CRAIG LATIMER

LAUREL M LEE

RON DESANTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL A STEINBERG

4925 Independence Pkwy, Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33634

Respondent Attorneys

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street, Suite 100

Tallahassee, FL 32399

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING TERMS OF CONSOLIDATION, RULE 26(f) DEADLINES, AND A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. These cases are consolidated for case-management purposes only and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:19cv300. The deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference among attorneys for all parties in any of these cases is 8/5/2019. The deadline to file the 26(f) report is 8/12 /2019. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for 8/15/2019 11:00 AMat 11:00 a.m.in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/23/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/17/2019. (kjw) **Order docketed in Lead Case and Consolidated Cases.** Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. **Please use the new judge's initials for future filings - 4:19cv272-RH/CAS. (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER CONSOLIDATING REASSIGNED CASE WITH COMMON DOCKET. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to consolidate Case No. 4:19cv272 with Case No. 4:19cv300, the common docket, for the purposes of case management. The Clerk is directed to connect all lawyers from the consolidated case to Case No. 4:19cv300. A paper that is applicable to the consolidated case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately. Cases associated., Set Consolidated Flags. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION.I hereby disqualify myself from participation as a judge in this case.SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 07/03/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Cases by LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to LAUREL M LEE. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to CRAIG LATIMER. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

2 #3

Proposed Summon for Ron Desantis

2 #2

Proposed Summon for Laurel Lee

2 #1

Proposed Summon for Craig Latimer

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summon for Craig Latimer, #2 Proposed Summon for Laurel Lee, #3 Proposed Summon for Ron Desantis) (STEINBERG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, and Mandamus ( Filing fee $47; receipt number AFLNDC-4522271.), filed by Luis A Mendez. (STEINBERG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/15/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING TERMS OF CONSOLIDATION, RULE 26(f) DEADLINES, AND A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. These cases are consolidated for case-management purposes only and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:19cv300. The deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference among attorneys for all parties in any of these cases is 8/5/2019. The deadline to file the 26(f) report is 8/12 /2019. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for 8/15/2019 11:00 AMat 11:00 a.m.in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/23/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/17/2019. (kjw) **Order docketed in Lead Case and Consolidated Cases.** Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. **Please use the new judge's initials for future filings - 4:19cv272-RH/CAS. (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER CONSOLIDATING REASSIGNED CASE WITH COMMON DOCKET. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to consolidate Case No. 4:19cv272 with Case No. 4:19cv300, the common docket, for the purposes of case management. The Clerk is directed to connect all lawyers from the consolidated case to Case No. 4:19cv300. A paper that is applicable to the consolidated case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately. Cases associated., Set Consolidated Flags. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION.I hereby disqualify myself from participation as a judge in this case.SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 07/03/2019. (rcb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Related Cases by LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to LAUREL M LEE. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to CRAIG LATIMER. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#3) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number FLN400036960. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summon for Craig Latimer, #2 Proposed Summon for Laurel Lee, #3 Proposed Summon for Ron Desantis) (STEINBERG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, and Mandamus ( Filing fee $47; receipt number AFLNDC-4522271.), filed by Luis A Mendez. (STEINBERG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less