This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:23:25 (UTC).

Mendez v. BAM Hospitality LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Mendez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BAM Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01121

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Epifanio Julio Mendez

Defendants

Joseph M. Juliano

Jacqueline Juliano

BAM Hospitality LLC

Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC

Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC doing business as Patsy's Pizzeria

BAM Hospitality LLC doing business as Patsy's Pizzeria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Hans Cooper

Attorney at Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC

10 Grand Central, 155 East 44Th Street, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Gabriel Altman

Attorney at Mintz and Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jeffrey D. Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold, LLP

600 Third Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order Stipulation to be So Ordered

#8

(#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) by BAM Hospitality LLC, Jacqueline Juliano, Joseph M. Juliano, Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation to be So Ordered) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Altman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Altman, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically because we had to pay twice for same case by Epifanio Julio Mendez. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BAM Hospitality LLC, Jacqueline Juliano, Joseph M. Juliano, Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12464855 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Epifanio Julio Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/17/2020. (Dixon, Roy) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) by BAM Hospitality LLC, Jacqueline Juliano, Joseph M. Juliano, Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation to be So Ordered) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Altman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Altman, Gabriel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically because we had to pay twice for same case by Epifanio Julio Mendez. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BAM Hospitality LLC, Jacqueline Juliano, Joseph M. Juliano, Patsy's Bay Ridge LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12464855 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Epifanio Julio Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Hans Cooper