Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 12:05:08 (UTC).

Mendez v. Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Mendez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raul Mendez

Meridian, ID 83646

Defendants

Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees

Gretchen Casseroti

Mary DeWalt

Meridian Library District Board of Trustees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Elia

Attorney at Moore Elia & Kraft, LLP

702 W. Idaho Street Suite #800, Po Box 6756

Boise, ID 83702

Peter Eugene Thomas

Attorney at Hawley Troxell

Po Box 1617

Boise, ID 83701

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2021.(Elia, Michael)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Raul Mendez. Replies due by 2/18/2021.(jd)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jd)

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Michael J Elia appearing for Defendants Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Elia, Michael)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees and to Raul Mendez re #5 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/26/2021. (jd)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Elia on behalf of Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees (Elia, Michael)

#4

(#4) Tri-County Process Serving LLC receipt and SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Ada Community Libraries served on 1/4/2021. (kt) Modified on 1/8/2021 to include receipt(kt).

#3

(#3) Tri-County Process Service LLC receipt and SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Meridian Library District served on 1/5/2021. (kt)

2 #1

Ada Community Libraries

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Ada Community Libraries)(kt) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2021.(Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Raul Mendez. Replies due by 2/18/2021.(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Michael J Elia appearing for Defendants Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees and to Raul Mendez re #5 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/26/2021. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Elia on behalf of Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Gretchen Casseroti, Mary DeWalt, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Tri-County Process Serving LLC receipt and SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Ada Community Libraries served on 1/4/2021. (kt) Modified on 1/8/2021 to include receipt(kt).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Tri-County Process Service LLC receipt and SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Mendez. Meridian Library District served on 1/5/2021. (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ada Community Libraries Board of Trustees, Meridian Library District Board of Trustees. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Ada Community Libraries)(kt) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Elia