This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2021 at 19:02:55 (UTC).

MENASHE et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 MENASHE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah A. Robinson and Zia M. Faruqui. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00046

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Deborah A. Robinson

Zia M. Faruqui

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI

ALYN TIRAN

LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH

MALKA SARID

R.M.

ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH

GAD SIBONI

ZIV SHACHAR

GILAT KOLANGI

YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH

ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI

SARIT PRI

VERED KUZA

ANAT COHEN

MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH

BATLIN VLADISLAV

YAEL MAMAN

YAAKOV PREIS

CHANA LEVI

YEHUDIT MENASHE

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Asher Perlin

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ASHER PERLIN

4600 Sheridan Street, Suite 303

Hollywood, FL 33021

Other Attorneys

Andrew E. Siegel

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

Christian James Pistilli

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Stephen Pierce Anthony

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Exhibit

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Certificate of Service

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian James Pistilli on behalf of COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP (Pistilli, Christian) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to opposition to motion re 1 MOTION for Order filed by ADI ALEGARSI, LEVANA ALEGARSI, YOSEF ALEGARSI, STAS ANTONOV, TALI MENASHE AVNER, ANAT COHEN, ESTATE OF AMIR MENASHE, ESTATE OF ELIOR PREIS, ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI, ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH, ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI, DANIEL FAHIMA, LIAT FROST, CHEN GOLD, BINYAMIN HARUSH, ORIT HARUSH, DAVID KOLANGI, GILAT KOLANGI, RINA KOLANGI, YAAKOV KOLANGI, AMIT KUZA, VERED KUZA, CHANA LEVI, GAL MALKA, YAEL MAMAN, NATALIE MENASHE, OFIR MENASHE, YEHUDIT MENASHE, YITZCHAK MENASHE, MOSHE MOSRI, EDNA PREIS, YAAKOV PREIS, SARIT PRI, R.M., SAGIT RUBIN, MALKA SARID, SHALOM SARID, AVI SHACHAR, HADAR SHACHAR, ZIV SHACHAR, CHEN SHACHAR-SABACH, LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH, MATAN SHACHAR-SABACH, MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YITZCHAK SHRIKI, ROMAN SHUSTER, GAD SIBONI, RAYMOND SIBONI, NIVA SIGAUI, SHIRLEY TIMOR, ALYN TIRAN, BATLIN VLADISLAV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perlin, Asher) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply by 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 5/24/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file Reply in Support of Application by ADI ALEGARSI, LEVANA ALEGARSI, YOSEF ALEGARSI, STAS ANTONOV, TALI MENASHE AVNER, ANAT COHEN, ESTATE OF AMIR MENASHE, ESTATE OF ELIOR PREIS, ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI, ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH, ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI, DANIEL FAHIMA, LIAT FROST, CHEN GOLD, BINYAMIN HARUSH, ORIT HARUSH, DAVID KOLANGI, GILAT KOLANGI, RINA KOLANGI, YAAKOV KOLANGI, AMIT KUZA, VERED KUZA, CHANA LEVI, GAL MALKA, YAEL MAMAN, NATALIE MENASHE, OFIR MENASHE, YEHUDIT MENASHE, YITZCHAK MENASHE, MOSHE MOSRI, EDNA PREIS, YAAKOV PREIS, SARIT PRI, R.M., SAGIT RUBIN, MALKA SARID, SHALOM SARID, AVI SHACHAR, HADAR SHACHAR, ZIV SHACHAR, CHEN SHACHAR-SABACH, LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH, MATAN SHACHAR-SABACH, MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YITZCHAK SHRIKI, ROMAN SHUSTER, GAD SIBONI, RAYMOND SIBONI, NIVA SIGAUI, SHIRLEY TIMOR, ALYN TIRAN, BATLIN VLADISLAV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlin, Asher) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition to the 1 Application of Natalie Menashe, et al. for an Order Permitting Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Andrew) Modified to add linkage on 5/4/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Siegel on behalf of COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP (Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ADI ALEGARSI, LEVANA ALEGARSI, YOSEF ALEGARSI, STAS ANTONOV, TALI MENASHE AVNER, ANAT COHEN, ESTATE OF AMIR MENASHE, ESTATE OF ELIOR PREIS, ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI, ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH, ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI, DANIEL FAHIMA, LIAT FROST, CHEN GOLD, BINYAMIN HARUSH, ORIT HARUSH, DAVID KOLANGI, GILAT KOLANGI, RINA KOLANGI, YAAKOV KOLANGI, AMIT KUZA, VERED KUZA, CHANA LEVI, GAL MALKA, YAEL MAMAN, NATALIE MENASHE, OFIR MENASHE, YEHUDIT MENASHE, YITZCHAK MENASHE, MOSHE MOSRI, EDNA PREIS, YAAKOV PREIS, SARIT PRI, R.M., SAGIT RUBIN, MALKA SARID, SHALOM SARID, AVI SHACHAR, HADAR SHACHAR, ZIV SHACHAR, CHEN SHACHAR-SABACH, LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH, MATAN SHACHAR-SABACH, MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YITZCHAK SHRIKI, ROMAN SHUSTER, GAD SIBONI, RAYMOND SIBONI, NIVA SIGAUI, SHIRLEY TIMOR, ALYN TIRAN, BATLIN VLADISLAV re Order on Motion for Waiver, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Perlin, Asher) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER adopting #6 Parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/1/2021; Reply due by 5/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 3/17/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order by COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Anthony, Stephen) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Pierce Anthony on behalf of COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP (Anthony, Stephen) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADI ALEGARSI, LEVANA ALEGARSI, YOSEF ALEGARSI, STAS ANTONOV, TALI MENASHE AVNER, ANAT COHEN, ESTATE OF AMIR MENASHE, ESTATE OF ELIOR PREIS, ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI, ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH, ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI, DANIEL FAHIMA, LIAT FROST, CHEN GOLD, BINYAMIN HARUSH, ORIT HARUSH, DAVID KOLANGI, GILAT KOLANGI, RINA KOLANGI, YAAKOV KOLANGI, AMIT KUZA, VERED KUZA, CHANA LEVI, GAL MALKA, YAEL MAMAN, NATALIE MENASHE, OFIR MENASHE, YEHUDIT MENASHE, YITZCHAK MENASHE, MOSHE MOSRI, EDNA PREIS, YAAKOV PREIS, SARIT PRI, R.M., SAGIT RUBIN, MALKA SARID, SHALOM SARID, AVI SHACHAR, HADAR SHACHAR, ZIV SHACHAR, CHEN SHACHAR-SABACH, LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH, MATAN SHACHAR-SABACH, MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YITZCHAK SHRIKI, ROMAN SHUSTER, GAD SIBONI, RAYMOND SIBONI, NIVA SIGAUI, SHIRLEY TIMOR, ALYN TIRAN, BATLIN VLADISLAV re Order,, Revised Certificate of Service. (Perlin, Asher) (Entered: 03/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADI ALEGARSI, LEVANA ALEGARSI, YOSEF ALEGARSI, STAS ANTONOV, TALI MENASHE AVNER, ANAT COHEN, ESTATE OF AMIR MENASHE, ESTATE OF ELIOR PREIS, ESTATE OF KOCHAVA SHRIKI, ESTATE OF MAOR HARUSH, ESTATE OF YITZCHAK KOLANGI, DANIEL FAHIMA, LIAT FROST, CHEN GOLD, BINYAMIN HARUSH, ORIT HARUSH, DAVID KOLANGI, GILAT KOLANGI, RINA KOLANGI, YAAKOV KOLANGI, AMIT KUZA, VERED KUZA, CHANA LEVI, GAL MALKA, YAEL MAMAN, NATALIE MENASHE, OFIR MENASHE, YEHUDIT MENASHE, YITZCHAK MENASHE, MOSHE MOSRI, EDNA PREIS, YAAKOV PREIS, SARIT PRI, R.M., SAGIT RUBIN, MALKA SARID, SHALOM SARID, AVI SHACHAR, HADAR SHACHAR, ZIV SHACHAR, CHEN SHACHAR-SABACH, LINOI SHACHAR-SABACH, MATAN SHACHAR-SABACH, MIRIAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YORAM SHACHAR-SABACH, YITZCHAK SHRIKI, ROMAN SHUSTER, GAD SIBONI, RAYMOND SIBONI, NIVA SIGAUI, SHIRLEY TIMOR, ALYN TIRAN, BATLIN VLADISLAV re Order,, . (Perlin, Asher) (Entered: 03/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DENYING in part 1 Petitioners' Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 only to the extent that Petitioners request to proceed Ex Parte for the reasons discussed at the March 4, 2021 Status Hearing. Petitioners shall serve this Order and the Application upon Covington & Burling, LLP by March 9, 2021. If Covington & Burling, LLP intends to oppose the Application, they shall confer with Petitioners to submit a joint proposed scheduling order by March 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 3/5/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER GRANTING 2 Petitioners' Motion for Waiver of Local Rules 5.1(c)(1) and 11.1. It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners are not required to list the full residence address of the parties in the caption of the initial pleadings. It is further ORDERED that Petitioners file under seal a list containing the names and residence addresses of all Applicants within 30 days of the date of this Minute Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 3/5/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2021. Motion Hearing concluded. Court Reporter FTR-Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4: [12:01:37-12:16:53] (ztl) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing re: 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 set for 3/4/2021 at 12:00 PM via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. (lclw) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616103521. (ztd) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R.M. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian J. Pistilli