This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 09:33:08 (UTC).

Mena v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 Mena filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Anne C. Conway. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00308

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Anne C. Conway

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yoine Mena

Defendants

Oportun, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Octavio Gomez

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

One Tampa City Center Ste 700, 201 N Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602-5157

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A. Escarez

Attorney at Theodora Oringher PC

1840 Century Park East, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2120

Oliver Max Birman

Attorney at Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli, & Albright, P.L.

200 S Andrews Ave., Suite 600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Paul Dewey Turner

Attorney at Perlman, Bajandas, Yevoli & Albright, PL

Suite 600, 200 S Andrews Ave

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Tom Kiernan Schulte

Attorney at Jones Day

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER dismissing case against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #30 Notice of settlement. Clerk is directed to terminate defendant as a party. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/9/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of settlement as to defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ONLY) by Yoine Mena (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#28

(#28) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2021 Discovery due by 7/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2022 Pretrial statement due by 12/2/2022 All other motions due by 9/2/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/20/2021 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/20/2022 Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 1/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/30/2021. Lead counsel to contact opposing counsel and mediator, coordinate dates and file a notice with the court within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/7/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#27

(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#26

(#26) ORDER to strike re: #25 Notice (Other) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/31/2021. (MB) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

25 #1

Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order

#25

(#25) (STRICKEN BY #26 ORDER) NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Schulte, Tom) Modified on 3/31/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#24

(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Oportun, Inc..(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#22

(#22) RENEWED MOTION for Joseph A. Escarez to appear pro hac vice by Oportun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Text modified on 3/25/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yoine Mena. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yoine Mena. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/17/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/17/2021. (MB) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Oportun, Inc.

1 #2

Proposed Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Oportun, Inc..(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER dismissing case against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #30 Notice of settlement. Clerk is directed to terminate defendant as a party. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/9/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of settlement as to defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ONLY) by Yoine Mena (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#29) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AKC) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2021 Discovery due by 7/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2022 Pretrial statement due by 12/2/2022 All other motions due by 9/2/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/20/2021 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/20/2022 Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 1/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/30/2021. Lead counsel to contact opposing counsel and mediator, coordinate dates and file a notice with the court within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/7/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER to strike re: #25 Notice (Other) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/31/2021. (MB) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) (STRICKEN BY #26 ORDER) NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Schulte, Tom) Modified on 3/31/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Oportun, Inc..(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 RENEWED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/25/2021. (MB) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RENEWED MOTION for Joseph A. Escarez to appear pro hac vice by Oportun, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Text modified on 3/25/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Schulte, Tom) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 02/18/2021 by Yoine Mena as to Oportun, Inc.. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 02/18/2021 by Yoine Mena as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yoine Mena. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yoine Mena. (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/17/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/17/2021. (MB) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0308-ACC-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Oportun, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17885708) filed by Yoine Mena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Oportun, Inc.)(Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Octavio Gomez