This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

MENA v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MENA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor, James R. Sweeney II, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

James R. Sweeney II

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA MENA

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basil E. Adham

Attorney at JOHNSON LAW GROUP

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff MARIA MENA. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARIA MENA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5795938) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-00036-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/14/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • (#8) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:20-cv-00028-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00031-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00033-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00034-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00035-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00036-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00040-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 1/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00028-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00031-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00033-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00034-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00035-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00036-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00040-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/14/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-00036-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff MARIA MENA. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARIA MENA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5795938) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.