This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 09:41:37 (UTC).

Memsen v. USA

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Memsen filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Reidinger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charles William Memsen

Cumberland, MD 21501

Respondent

USA

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order entered on 9/21/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns, on 9/21/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER dismissing #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/21/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 1:17-cr-77 ( USA2255Group added), filed by Charles William Memsen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(khm) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order entered on 9/21/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns, on 9/21/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER dismissing #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/21/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 1:17-cr-77 ( USA2255Group added), filed by Charles William Memsen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(khm) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less