Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 08:41:00 (UTC).

Melson v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Melson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Melson

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Heenan

Attorney at HEENAN & COOK

1631 Zimmerman Trail

Billings, MT 59102

Timothy M. Bechtold

Attorney at BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Po Box 7051

Missoula, MT 59807-7051

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen A. D'Aunoy

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Leo S. Ward

Attorney at BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN

800 N. Last Chance Gulch, Suite 101, Po Box 1697

Helena, MT 59624-1697

M. Christy S. McCann

Attorney at BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN, P.C. - MISSOULA

201 W. Railroad Street, Suite 300

Missoula, MT 59802

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen A. D'Aunoy. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/15/2020. (NOS) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

6 #1

Affidavit Stephen A. D'Aunoy

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION Stephen A. D'Aunoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2481570.) M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephen A. D'Aunoy, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer FCA US LLC answer due 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/7/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Emailed to counsel.) (NOS) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Eric Melson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen A. D'Aunoy. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/15/2020. (NOS) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION Stephen A. D'Aunoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2481570.) M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephen A. D'Aunoy, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer FCA US LLC answer due 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/7/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (McCann, M. Christy) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Emailed to counsel.) (NOS) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketFiling fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2462523. (NOS) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Eric Melson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leo S. Ward

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen A. D'Aunoy