This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2022 at 08:35:54 (UTC).

Melody Business Finance, LLC v. Falcone et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Melody Business Finance, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Falcone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01698

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melody Business Finance, LLC

Defendants

Lisa M. Falcone

Philip Falcone

Three Hundreth Street, LLC

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Woods

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Scott Manning Danner

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Brian Taylor Goldman

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Timothy Wood Grinsell

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Harlan Mitchell Lazarus

Attorney at Lazarus & Lazarus, P.C.

240 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

14 #9

Exhibit H

14 #8

Exhibit G

14 #7

Exhibit F

14 #6

Exhibit E Part 2

14 #5

Exhibit E Part 1

14 #4

Exhibit D

14 #3

Exhibit C

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Woods on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Woods, Patrick) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Wood Grinsell on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Manning Danner on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Melissa A. Childs to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. Office was not selected. Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service on USA

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint filed in NY Supreme Court

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lisa M. Falcone, Philip Falcone, Three Hundreth Street, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Document filed by Melody Business Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E Part 1, #6 Exhibit E Part 2, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H).(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Woods on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Woods, Patrick) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service..(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Scott M. Danner dated March 28, 2022 Document filed by Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of Lisa M. Falcone, Philip Falcone, Three Hundreth Street, LLC..(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 9, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/14/2022) (rro) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Internal Revenue Service answer due 4/10/2022. (vfr) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. The Government's deadline to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to April 10, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket number 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/11/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from AUSA Melissa A. Childs dated 03/10/2022. Document filed by Internal Revenue Service..(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Taylor Goldman on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Goldman, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Wood Grinsell on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Manning Danner on behalf of Melody Business Finance, LLC..(Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Melissa A. Childs to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. Office was not selected. Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa A. Childs. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Kings; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Childs, Melissa) Modified on 3/2/2022 (pc). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150984/2022..Document filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint filed in NY Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service on USA).(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less