This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 04:33:39 (UTC).

Melody Business Finance LLC v. Croxton 2 LLC et. al.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Melody Business Finance LLC filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Croxton 2 LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01097

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melody Business Finance LLC

Defendants

Lisa M. Falcone

Philip Falcone

United States Internal Revenue Service

Croxton 2 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen A Sebaski

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Scott Danner

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Timothy Wood Grinsell

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Zachary Adam Kerner

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel P. Goldberg

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan M. Lazarus

Attorney at Lazarus & Lazarus, P.C.

240 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Julia Glen

Attorney at DOJ-Tax

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044

Alan Martin Shapiro

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044-0055

Thelma A Lizama

Attorney at DOJ-Tax

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States Internal Revenue Service (Glen, Julia) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States Internal Revenue Service (Glen, Julia) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Melody Business Finance LLC. (Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melody Business Finance LLC (Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Danner on behalf of Melody Business Finance LLC (aty to be noticed) (Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan M. Lazarus on behalf of Croxton 2 LLC, Lisa M. Falcone, Philip Falcone (aty to be noticed) (Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#11

(#11) STATE COURT RECORD: Containing a certified copy of Clerks Office minutes (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#12

(#12) Letter addressed to Honorable Margo K. Brodie by Melody Business Finance LLC (Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Lizama, Thelma) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Internal Revenue Service from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 601991/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. ( Filing fee $ 402) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Glen, Julia) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lizama, Thelma) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by May 31, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Lizama, Thelma) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter addressed to Honorable Margo K. Brodie by Melody Business Finance LLC (Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATE COURT RECORD: Containing a certified copy of Clerks Office minutes (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan M. Lazarus on behalf of Croxton 2 LLC, Lisa M. Falcone, Philip Falcone (aty to be noticed) (Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Danner on behalf of Melody Business Finance LLC (aty to be noticed) (Danner, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for the United States to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until April 18, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/7/2022. (Jacobwitz, Beth) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melody Business Finance LLC (Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Melody Business Finance LLC. (Grinsell, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lizama, Thelma) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States Internal Revenue Service (Glen, Julia) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSECOND Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States Internal Revenue Service (Glen, Julia) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Internal Revenue Service from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 601991/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. ( Filing fee $ 402) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Glen, Julia) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less