This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 09:34:47 (UTC).

MELNYK v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MELNYK filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-13163

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHANIE MELNYK

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE A. PARFITT

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1825 K Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

218 Commerce Street, P.O. Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

John Chadwick Coots

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON, L.L.P.

1155 F Street, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20004

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas Tobias Locke

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2688

THOMAS T. LOCKE

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

975 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1454

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit B - Son Affidavit

5 #1

Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit

#5

#4

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Short Form Complaint by STEPHANIE MELNYK. (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of STEPHANIE MELNYK (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (LOCKE, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-02407. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EMAIL dated 9/23/2020 from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-229) dated 9/22/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by STEPHANIE MELNYK. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-2017 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7523524) filed by STEPHANIE MELNYK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL