This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 08:47:14 (UTC).

Mellenthin v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Mellenthin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00716

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cristina Mellenthin

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC doing business as Walmart

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Wayne McKey

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeremy W McKey

2695 Villa Creek Drive, Suite 155

Dallas, TX 75234

Craig Weldon Thomas

Attorney at Law Office of Jeremy McKey

5899 Preston Road, Suite 203

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant Attorneys

Bevan A Rhine

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Daniel A Ortega

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Rickey J Brantley

Attorney at Rickey J. Brantley, Attorney at Law, P.C.

855 Texas Street, Suite 100

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT filed by Cristina Mellenthin. (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER: Having considered the #12 Joint Objection, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/9/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Request to Substitute Appointed Mediator

#12

(#12) MOTION Joint Objection and Request to Substitute Appointed Mediator filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Request to Substitute Appointed Mediator) (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Wayne McKey on behalf of Cristina Mellenthin. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning October 10, 2022 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/19/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/30/2021) (sre) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED on or before July 13, 2021, to either (1) file a status report explaining how her counsel satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a) (e.g., counsels residence is in this district), or (2) file a notice of appearance of local counsel that satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/29/2021) (npk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel A Ortega for Bevan Rhine on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Jeremy Wayne McKey on behalf of Cristina Mellenthin. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Mellenthin. (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report shall be filed on or before 6/28/2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/7/2021) (npk) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11945466) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS REPORT filed by Cristina Mellenthin. (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Having considered the #12 Joint Objection, the Court finds that it should be and hereby is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/9/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION Joint Objection and Request to Substitute Appointed Mediator filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Request to Substitute Appointed Mediator) (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Wayne McKey on behalf of Cristina Mellenthin. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning October 10, 2022 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/19/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/30/2021) (sre) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeadline Modification: Deadlines set. Status Report due by 7/13/2021 Per Order #9 . (wxc) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED on or before July 13, 2021, to either (1) file a status report explaining how her counsel satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a) (e.g., counsels residence is in this district), or (2) file a notice of appearance of local counsel that satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/29/2021) (npk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel A Ortega for Bevan Rhine on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Jeremy Wayne McKey on behalf of Cristina Mellenthin. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Mellenthin. (McKey, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report shall be filed on or before 6/28/2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/7/2021) (npk) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart (filed in State Court). (npk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Walmart. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11945466) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rickey J Brantley