This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:52:03 (UTC).

Mellaconic IP LLC v. Fibar USA LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Mellaconic IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fibar USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05739

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mellaconic IP LLC

Defendant

Fibar USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184, 2620 N. Burling St.,

Chicago, IL 60614

Steven G Kalberg

Attorney at None

P.O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand and Sebolt LPA

4940 Munson St. N.W., Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Mellaconic IP LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18810984. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A United States Patent No. 9,986,435, #3 Exhibit B Claim Chart re Fibaro Home Center App)(Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit List

1 #2

Exhibit A United States Patent No. 9,986,435

1 #3

Exhibit B Claim Chart re Fibaro Home Center App

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mellaconic IP LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#7

(#7) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by January 11, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by Andrew S. Curfman (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mellaconic IP LLC as to Fibar USA LLC on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The unopposed motion for extension of time to answer (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by January 14, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The unopposed motion for extension of time to answer (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by January 14, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mellaconic IP LLC as to Fibar USA LLC on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by Andrew S. Curfman (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by January 11, 2022. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fibar USA LLC (cxr, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mellaconic IP LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mellaconic IP LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Mellaconic IP LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18810984. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A United States Patent No. 9,986,435, #3 Exhibit B Claim Chart re Fibaro Home Center App)(Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mellaconic IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G Kalberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Bennett