This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2022 at 08:35:32 (UTC).

Melerine v. Hartford Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Melerine filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02029

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Melerine

Defendant

Hartford Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.

Attorney at Loyd J. Bourgeois, LLC

50 Wade St Ste 9

Luling, LA 70070

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life Insurance Company. (js) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hartford Life Insurance Company on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Bourgeois, Loyd) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hartford Life Insurance Company on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Bourgeois, Loyd) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life Insurance Company. (js) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Summons submitted for issuance is not on the appropriate Court form, AO 440, located on the Courts website under Forms. For future filings, appropriate form must be provided. Clerk has taken appropriate action. No further action necessary.(js) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9427417) filed by Kevin Melerine. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party Kevin Melerine(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 7/5/2022 (js). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartford Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.