This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:56:05 (UTC).

MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC. v. WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO , INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.

Defendant

WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY

777 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Detroit, MI 48226

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lori W. Azzara

Attorney at COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN PC

525 William Penn Place, Suite 3005

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Keefe A. Brooks

Attorney at BROOKS WILKINS SHARKEY & TURCO PLLC

401 S. Old Woodward, Suite 400

Birmingham, MI 48009

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Keefe A. Brooks for WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/15/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

5 #3

Envelope

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Keefe A. Brooks to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP067985), filed by Defendant WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(CKM) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W. Azzara on behalf of Plaintiff MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY, filed by MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5754387) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Keefe A. Brooks for WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/15/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Keefe A. Brooks to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP067985), filed by Defendant WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(CKM) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W. Azzara on behalf of Plaintiff MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WALBRIDGE ALDINGER COMPANY, filed by MEL-KAY ELECTRIC CO., INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5754387) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Azzara, Lori) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.