This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 08:26:39 (UTC).

Mejias v. Mcivery et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Mejias filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mcivery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10440

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Mejias

Defendants

Lily Transportation Corp.

Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT

Jason Mcivery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shunyi Joonho Hong

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Adam Segal

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B Filed Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C Order of Transfer

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Order for Remand

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E. - Plaintiff's Settlement Demand

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (vf). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp...(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (lb). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (lb). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shunyi Joonho Hong on behalf of Carlos Mejias..(Hong, Shunyi) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Jason Mcivery, Lily Transportation Corp., Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Jason Mcivery, Lily Transportation Corp., Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shunyi Joonho Hong on behalf of Carlos Mejias..(Hong, Shunyi) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Segal to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Segal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jason A. Mcivery. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Adam Segal to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the corporate disclosure statement is not correct; the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here # NYSD form page (lb) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (lb). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp...(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (lb). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segal, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2022 (vf). (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF005667/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27067542).Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, LT, LLT, Lily Transportation Corp., Jason A. Mcivery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Filed Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Order of Transfer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Order for Remand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E. - Plaintiff's Settlement Demand).(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less