This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 09:10:37 (UTC).

Mejias v. Mcivery et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Mejias filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mcivery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip M. Halpern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-09830

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip M. Halpern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Mejias

Defendants

Jason A. Mcivery

Lily Transportation Corp.

Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joonho S Hong

Attorney at Parker Waichman, LLP

6 Harbor Park Drive

Port Washington, NY 11050

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Adam Segal

Attorney at Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi LLP

110 East 59Th Street 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Ian Kingsley

Attorney at Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi

110 E. 59Th Street, 22Nd Floor, New York

New York, NY 10022

Jeffrey A. Segal

Attorney at Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi, LLP

110 East 59Th Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10080

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER Based upon the foregoing, this action is REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to send a copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/22/2022) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp., Jason A. Mcivery, Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp., Jason A. Mcivery, Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1z e22 e53 37 1007 628 5 on 11/22/2022. (jca) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Based upon the foregoing, this action is REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to send a copy of this Order to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/22/2022) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vba) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Unassigned Judge. (vba) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Northern; Case Number: 5:22-cv-01101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Orange County, case number EF005667-2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6077857) filed by Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT, and Lily Transportation Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ztc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 11/18/2022.] (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Kingsley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY A. SEGAL