5:22-CV-01101
10/24/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miroslav Lovric
Mae A. D'Agostino
Carlos Mejias
Jason A. Mcivery
Lily Transportation Corp.
Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT
Ian Kingsley
Jeffrey A. Segal
(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Orange County, case number EF005667-2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6077857) filed by Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT, and Lily Transportation Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint
Civil Cover Sheet
Certificate of Service
DocketCase transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-09830, filed 11/18/2022. (jmb) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase transferred electronically to Southern District of New York pursuant to Order of Transfer dated 11/09/2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Orange County, case number EF005667-2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6077857) filed by Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT, and Lily Transportation Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
[-] Read Less