This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/23/2023 at 02:16:21 (UTC).

Mejias v. Mcivery et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Mejias filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mcivery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Miroslav Lovric and Mae A. D'Agostino. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01101

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Mejias

Defendants

Jason A. Mcivery

Lily Transportation Corp.

Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Kingsley

Jeffrey A. Segal

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Orange County, case number EF005667-2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6077857) filed by Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT, and Lily Transportation Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-09830, filed 11/18/2022. (jmb) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase transferred electronically to Southern District of New York pursuant to Order of Transfer dated 11/09/2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on November 9, 2022. (ztc) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Orange County. (ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Orange County, case number EF005667-2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6077857) filed by Ryder Truck Rental LT, LLT, and Lily Transportation Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ztc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less