This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:17:04 (UTC).

Mejia v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Mejia filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Magdalaine Lizette Mejia

Mission, TX 78572

Defendant

The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Douglas Cronenwett

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C.

14160 N. Dallas Parkway, Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hidalgo County, 389th Judicial District, case number C-0123-22-H (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27630327) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JP Morgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JP Morgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) OPINION AND ORDER regarding #4 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6), and Brief in Support,. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#6

(#6) BILL OF COSTS in total amount $402.00 by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#7

(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 2/22/22.(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 2/22/22.(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BILL OF COSTS in total amount $402.00 by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OPINION AND ORDER regarding #4 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6), and Brief in Support,. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6), and Brief in Support, by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JP Morgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hidalgo County, 389th Judicial District, case number C-0123-22-H (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27630327) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JP Morgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Douglas Cronenwett