This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:02:47 (UTC).

Mejia v. JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Mejia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04654

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elmer Mejia

Defendants

Jose Suyo

JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Alexander Thomas

Attorney at The Law Office of Brandon A. Thomas

Suite 650, 1 Glenlake Pkwy.

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC. (jed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Elmer Mejia JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC c/o Jose A. Suyo Cardenas (registered agent) (Thomas, Brandon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Appendix Consent Form - Representative Plaintiff - Elmer Mejia

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9010862) filed by Elmer Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Consent Form - Representative Plaintiff - Elmer Mejia, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC. (jed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Elmer Mejia JS Elite Painting Pros, LLC c/o Jose A. Suyo Cardenas (registered agent) (Thomas, Brandon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9010862) filed by Elmer Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Consent Form - Representative Plaintiff - Elmer Mejia, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less