This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2019 at 07:34:09 (UTC).

Mejia v. Griggs et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Mejia filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Griggs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01647

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Mejia

Defendants

Gregory M Griggs

Geico Casualty Company

Andrus Transportation Services, Inc.

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theodore R. Ridder

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher James Witte

Attorney at Senter Goldfarb & Rice LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Heather A. Salg

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP-Greenwood Village

7935 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 312W

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Nathaniel Scott Barker

Attorney at Nathaniel S Barker, Attorney at Law

7935 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 312

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Lara Lahey Miller

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP-Greenwood Village

7935 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 312W

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Katherine Karamalegos Kust

Attorney at Sweetbaum Sands Anderson PC

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2100

Denver, CO 80202

Jon F. Sands

Attorney at Sweetbaum Sands Anderson PC

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2100

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#14

#13

#12

#11

#4

1 #13

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lara Lahey Miller on behalf of Geico Casualty CompanyAttorney Lara Lahey Miller added to party Geico Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Miller, Lara) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Gregory M Griggs.(Witte, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #4 Complaint Attorney Katherine Karamalegos Kust added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Kust, Katherine) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 8/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/22/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #13 ) is due 8/22/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants Andrus Transportation Services, Inc. and Gregory M Griggs' answers are due 6/28/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Gregory M Griggs. (Witte, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1647-SKC (angar, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theodore R. Ridder on behalf of Johnny MejiaAttorney Theodore R. Ridder added to party Johnny Mejia(pty:pla) (Ridder, Theodore) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#9) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#8) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Gregory M. Griggs on 5/30/2019. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant Geico Casualty Company's ANSWER and Jury Demand to #4 Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Corporate Service of Summons, Complaint upon Geico Casualty Company on May 3, 2019. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Geico Casualty Company, Gregory M Griggs, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Johnny Mejia.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather A. Salg on behalf of Geico Casualty CompanyAttorney Heather A. Salg added to party Geico Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Casualty Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31730. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6730746), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Andrus Transportation Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher James Witte