This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:32:16 (UTC).

Mejia-Santamaria v. USA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Mejia-Santamaria filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00897

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fredy Mejia-Santamaria

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Ernest Gonzalez

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - Plano

101 East Park Blvd, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75074

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USA as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #3 Order to Answer. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernest Gonzalez on behalf of USA (Gonzalez, Ernest) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO ANSWER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk of Court deliver a copy of the 2255 motion upon the United States Attorney, Plano, Texas. It is further ORDERED that the United States Attorney, on behalf of the United States of America, shall have sixty days from the receipt of this Order to answer the motion in full compliance with 28 U.S.C. 2255 and to show cause why the relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/6/2019. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate referral

#2

(#2) Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Envelope(s)

1 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Fredy Mejia-Santamaria. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USA as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #3 Order to Answer. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernest Gonzalez on behalf of USA (Gonzalez, Ernest) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO ANSWER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk of Court deliver a copy of the 2255 motion upon the United States Attorney, Plano, Texas. It is further ORDERED that the United States Attorney, on behalf of the United States of America, shall have sixty days from the receipt of this Order to answer the motion in full compliance with 28 U.S.C. 2255 and to show cause why the relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/6/2019. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Fredy Mejia-Santamaria. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.