This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:28:09 (UTC).

Meirowitz v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Meirowitz filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21081

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harriett Meirowitz

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Alan Goldstein

Attorney at Cellino & Barnes, P.C. (NYC)

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 930

New York, NY 10170

Defendant Attorneys

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH, LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1047

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/3/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Short Form Complaint by Harriett Meirowitz. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17946990)Document filed by Harriett Meirowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10386. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Short Form Complaint by Harriett Meirowitz. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10386. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/3/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17946990)Document filed by Harriett Meirowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.