This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 14:08:08 (UTC).

Meindertsma et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Meindertsma filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00708

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bruce Meindertsma

Jeanne Meindertsma

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

American Medical Systems Inc

Ethicon, LLC

Ethicon Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark E. Burton, Jr.

Attorney at HERSH & HERSH

Suite 2080, 601 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Andrew N. Faes

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jeffrey M. Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

William M. Audet

Attorney at AUDET & PARTNERS

Suite 500, 711 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Young S. Lee

Attorney at AUDET & PARTNERS

Suite 1460, 221 Main Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rachel Beth Abrams

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams

1700 Montgomery Street, Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jonathan Kieffer

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

William M. Gage

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Benjamin M. Watson

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

David B. Thomas

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Ashley Nader Stubbs

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Rebecca Lee Wiggs

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

Suite 1400, 1020 Highland Colony Parkway

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Christopher R. Cowan

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

1400 Lavaca Street, Suite 1000

Austin, TX 78701

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Laura H. Dixon

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Caroline Dye Walker

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

Suite 1000, 1819 5Th Avenue, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Erik W. Legg

Attorney at FARRELL WHITE & LEGG

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#115

RESTRICTED

#114

#113

#112

109 #1

Proposed Order

#109

108 #1

Proposed Order

#108

#107

#5

#4

#3

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

385 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Status Conference held on 8/11/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 8/11/2020 09:50 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ORDER GRANTING #109 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) ORDER GRANTING #108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Kuntz. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ORDER GRANTING #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Faes. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER GRANTING #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Cartmell. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Bruce Meindertsma, Jeanne Meindertsma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(de la Cerda, Pedro) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pedro de la Cerda for Jeffrey M. Kuntz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13763841) by on behalf of Bruce Meindertsma, Jeanne Meindertsma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(de la Cerda, Pedro) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pedro de la Cerda for Andrew N. Faes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13761244) by on behalf of Bruce Meindertsma, Jeanne Meindertsma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(de la Cerda, Pedro) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pedro de la Cerda for Thomas P. Cartmell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13761225) by on behalf of Bruce Meindertsma, Jeanne Meindertsma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(de la Cerda, Pedro) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 11/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 11/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 71 (Scheduling of Discovery Conferences) entered on 09/30/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Systems, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2680800. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Lee Wiggs