This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 09:17:37 (UTC).

Meijer, Inc. v. United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Meijer, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Fidelity Guaranty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meijer, Inc.

Defendants

United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA

Federal Insurance Company

The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Huntley Rice

Attorney at Sperling & Slater P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony L Osterlund

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

Suite 3500, 301 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

David Michael Edelstein

Attorney at Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP

301 East Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christopher J St. Jeanos

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

David J Fagnilli

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

127 Public Square, Suite 3510

Cleveland, OH 44114

Mark Engling

Attorney at Freund Freeze and Arnold

1 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Dayton, OH 45402

Robert E Chudakoff

Attorney at Ulmer and Berne LLP

1660 W. 2Nd St., Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113-1448

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Matthew W. McFarland to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 07/08/2021. (kaf) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Huntley Rice for Plaintiff Meijer, Inc. (Rice, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Exhibit to Complaint filed in State Court Montgomery County on 7/2/2021 in Case No. 2021-CV-02276. (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company.. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.. (Engling, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.. (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Defendant Federal Insurance Company of Consent to Removal (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J Fagnilli for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment originally filed 6/7/2021 in Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2021 CV 02276) by Meijer, Inc.. (kl) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan and Robert A. Kole. (kl) Filed document sent by e-mail to attorneys. (kl). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Chudakoff for Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. for United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.. (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketIntra District Transfer - Case transferred to Western Division at Dayton as case number 3:21cv182. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 3:21cv182. (kaf) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Matthew W. McFarland to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 07/08/2021. (kaf) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Meijer, Inc.. (Rice, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Huntley Rice for Plaintiff Meijer, Inc. (Rice, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Exhibit to Complaint filed in State Court Montgomery County on 7/2/2021 in Case No. 2021-CV-02276. (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Defendant United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company of Civil Cover Sheet (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Campbell, Drew) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company.. (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.. (Engling, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.. (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Defendant Federal Insurance Company of Consent to Removal (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J Fagnilli for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment originally filed 6/7/2021 in Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2021 CV 02276) by Meijer, Inc.. (kl) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Daniel M. Sullivan and Robert A. Kole. (kl) Filed document sent by e-mail to attorneys. (kl). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Chudakoff for Defendant American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company (Chudakoff, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. for United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.. (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CV-02276 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8390851), filed by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Osterlund, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Meijer, Inc. is a litigant