This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:24:32 (UTC).

Meier v. Wadena Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Meier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wadena Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01025

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Margrit Meier

Margrit Meier doing business as Hartland Inn

Defendant

Wadena Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

John F Mayer

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wadena Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 7/16/2020. (Graff, Ryan)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of Margrit Meier. Attorney(s) appearing: John F. Mayer (Mayer, John)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Website Image

1 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit A - September 4, 2019 letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wadena Insurance Company by Margrit Meier. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3502100) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 4, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Website Image, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wadena Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 7/16/2020. (Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of Margrit Meier. Attorney(s) appearing: John F. Mayer (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wadena Insurance Company by Margrit Meier. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3502100) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 4, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Website Image, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan R Graff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Mayer