This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:56:19 (UTC).

Mei Huang Wolfe v. Garland et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Mei Huang Wolfe filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01477

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mei Huang Wolfe

Defendants

Attorney General MERRICK GARLAND

Tracy Renaud

District Director Sandy Heathman

Director USCIS Alejandro Mayorkas

Director of the FBI Christopher Wray

Merrick Garland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yanpin Yang

Attorney at Law Office of Yang and Associates

6689 W Sam Houston Pkwy, Ste 302

Houston, TX 77072

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE #6 . Case terminated on June 28, 2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE #6 . Case terminated on June 28, 2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Plaintiffs by Mei Huang Wolfe, filed. (Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Request for Expedited Ruling re: #4 Agreed MOTION to Remand by Mei Huang Wolfe, filed. (Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION to Remand by Mei Huang Wolfe, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to DHS, #2 Summons to FBI, #3 Summons to Houston USCIS, #4 Summons to USCIS)(Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26380826) filed by Mei Huang Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-400 Interview Result, #2 Exhibit Notice of Cancellation, #3 Exhibit Communications with USCIS)(Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director of F.B.I. Christopher A. Wray is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yanpin Yang